Waste Management, Inc. et al v. Great Divide Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Waste Management, Inc., Waste Management of Virginia, Inc., King George Landfill, Inc. and King George Landfill Properties, LLC
Defendant: Great Divide Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company and Arthur A. Robinson
Case Number: 3:2017cv00060
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: M. Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 04/05/2019. (smej, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 03/12/2019. (smej, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Finding no error in the R&R, the Court: 1) ADOPTS the findings and recommendations set forth in the R&R, (ECF No. 50 ); 2) OVERRULES Defendants' objections; 3) GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 20 ); 4 ) DENIES AS MOOT Defendants' Motion to Drop Robinson, (ECF No. 28 ); 5) DENIES Defendants' Motion to Drop Subsidiaries, (ECF No. 29 ); 6) GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Strike, (ECF No. 37 ); 7) DISMISSES Defendants' Counterclaims I -B, 11-B, IV, and V-B; and, 8) DISMISSES the following Counter-Defendants: Baltimore Refuse Energy Systems Company; Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P., Wheelabrator Baltimore, Inc.; Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.L.C.; Waste Management of Maryland; Waste Management Disposal Services of Maryland, Inc.; Waste Management National Services, Inc.; Waste Management Services, Inc.; and, Wheelabrator Technologies, Inc. Because the Court dismisses the above Counter-Defendants, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Plai ntiffs' Agreed Motion Regarding Responses to Counterclaim. (ECF No. 47 .) In order to clarify the record, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file an Amended Counterclaim that complies with the R&R as fully adopted. Defendants SHALL file their Amende d Counterclaim by close of business October 10, 2017. The Court further GRANTS Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion Regarding Submission of Answer to Counterclaim, (ECF No. 22 ), and ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their Answer to Defendants' Amended Counterclaim by close of business October 24, 2017. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/03/2017. (nbrow)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waste Management, Inc. et al v. Great Divide Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Management, Inc.
Represented By: Faith Abar Alejandro
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Management of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Faith Abar Alejandro
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King George Landfill, Inc.
Represented By: Faith Abar Alejandro
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King George Landfill Properties, LLC
Represented By: Faith Abar Alejandro
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Divide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Robinson
Represented By: Matthew James O'Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?