Old Dominion Motors, Inc. et al v. Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Yeattes Brothers Rentals, LLC and Old Dominion Motors, Inc.
Defendant: Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00617
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.. (Hearn, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 Letter RECEIVED on 11/08/2018 from R. Clinton Clary, Jr. (Attachments: #1 State Court Order) (smej, )
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 11/19/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan is hereby extended to and including November 2, 2018. Further, the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for Thursday, November I, 2018, at 9:40 AM is CANCELED, in order that the Parties may first hold their Rule 26(f) conference. The Parties are directed to contact the Court within five (5) business days to reschedule the Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/31/2018. (tjoh, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 11/2/2018. Defendant will have six (6) daysfollowing Plaintiffs' filing of their Response to file a Reply. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/31/2018. (tjoh, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Discovery Plan by Old Dominion Motors, Inc., Yeattes Brothers Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Janson, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Memorandum in Support by Old Dominion Motors, Inc., Yeattes Brothers Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Janson, John)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc..(Hearn, David)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Moellar Janson on behalf of Old Dominion Motors, Inc., Yeattes Brothers Rentals, LLC (Janson, John)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 9:40 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.. (Hearn, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.. (Hearn, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.(tjoh, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greensville County Circuit Court, case number 18-227 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6267054.), filed by Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Dominion Motors, Inc. et al v. Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeattes Brothers Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Robert Clinton Clary, Jr.
Represented By: John Moellar Janson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Dominion Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Clinton Clary, Jr.
Represented By: John Moellar Janson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Ready Mix Products, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Wright Ward
Represented By: David W. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?