Reid v. Hillpoint Express LLC

Plaintiff: Juliann Reid
Defendant: Hillside Express LLC and Hillpoint Express LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00630
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Juliann Reid re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Consent Order (Hantzes, Nicholas)
November 8, 2018 Notice of Correction re #12 Financial Disclosure Statement: Filing attorney notified that all filings with the court must contain a nine element signature block at the end of the document as well as an electronic signature. (smej, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hillpoint Express LLC. (Miller, Mary)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hillpoint Express LLC. (Yates, Harry)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hillpoint Express LLC. (Yates, Harry)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #7 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Hillpoint Express, LLC, shall file their responsive pleadings with respect to the Complaint on or before November 7, 2018. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/01/2018. (smej, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Grace Miller on behalf of Hillpoint Express LLC (Miller, Mary)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Hillpoint Express LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yates, Harry)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hillpoint Express LLC served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (smej, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Hillpoint Express LLC. (Party originally served known was "Hillside Express LLC," but were identified incorrectly. Hillpoint Express LLC is the correct party) (smej, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Hillpoint Express LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/28/2018 with correct caption) (smej, ). Modified to correct docket text on 9/28/2018 (smej, ). Modified on 10/9/2018 (smej, ).
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Juliann Reid. (Hantzes, Nicholas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hillside Express LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hillpoint Express LLC (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6273152), filed by Juliann Reid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (smej, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/28/2018 with correct caption) (smej, ). Modified to correct docket text on 9/28/2018 (smej, ). Modified on 10/9/2018 (smej, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Hillpoint Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliann Reid
Represented By: Nicholas H. Hantzes
Represented By: Michael David Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillside Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillpoint Express LLC
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?