Black Diamond Commercial Finance, LLC v. Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc. et al

Appellee: Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc. and ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC
Interested Party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Appellant: Black Diamond Commercial Finance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00708
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL WITH PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 12/7/2018. (jsmi, )
December 6, 2018 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice by Black Diamond Commercial Finance, LLC. (Peterson, Ashley)
November 20, 2018 3 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. Additional Designation of Record documents to be submitted on paper by Appellants. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Designation of Record) (jsmi, )
October 16, 2018 2 Letter re: FRBP Rule. Mailed to attorney not admitted. (Attachments: #1 Rule 8018) (jsmi, )
October 15, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-32450-KLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jsmi, ) (Corrected Transmittal received from Bankruptcy Court and Main Document 1 replaced on 10/18/2018) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Diamond Commercial Finance, LLC v. Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick John Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC
Represented By: Patrick John Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Black Diamond Commercial Finance, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Maddock, III
Represented By: Dion William Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?