Heath et al v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Scott Rogers, Sean Lawrence, Marsha Heath and Robert Kemery
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00720
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 (DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/17/2018. (smej, ) Modified docket text on 12/17/2018 (smej, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trans Union, LLC, filed by Marsha Heath, Sean Lawrence, Robert Kemery, Scott Rogers.(Kelly, Kristi)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings #12 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the Amended Complaint with 2 days of the entry of this Order. Defendant shall file its responsive pleadings to the Amended Complaint on or before January 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/7/2018. (smej, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Marsha Heath, Robert Kemery, Sean Lawrence, Scott Rogers. (Kelly, Kristi)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings by Marsha Heath, Robert Kemery, Sean Lawrence, Scott Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Kelly, Kristi)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Albert Edward Hartmann for Trans Union, LLC. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/16/2018. (tjoh, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Michael Charles O'Neill for Trans Union, LLC. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/16/2018. (tjoh, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Aaron Sabalewski on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Sabalewski, Travis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles O'Neil and Certification of Local Counsel Robert M. Luck, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6365389. by Trans Union, LLC. (Luck, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Albert Edward Hartmann and Certification of Local Counsel Robert M. Luck, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6365364. by Trans Union, LLC. (Luck, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Trans Union, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (smej, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TRANS UNION LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #3 is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendant Trans Union LLC to serve a responsive pleadings or other responsive motions shall be extended by, through, and including December 5, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/13/2018. (smej, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Luck, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luck, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADER and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6325927), filed by Marsha Heath, Sean Lawrence, Robert Kemery and Scott Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath et al v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rogers
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lawrence
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Heath
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kemery
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Robert Miltz Luck, III
Represented By: Albert Edward Hartmann
Represented By: Michael Charles O'Neill
Represented By: Travis Aaron Sabalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?