Knapp v. Zoetis Inc.

Plaintiff: Ashley Knapp
Defendant: Zoetis Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00753
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on November 27, 2018, the Parties to the above-referenced action filed a #4 Stipulation to Remand Removed Action. The Court having reviewed that stipulation and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1. The Parties' stipulation is approved; and, 2. Eastern District of Virginia case number 3:18-cv-00753 styled Knapp v. Zoetis, Inc. is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court for the City of Richmond. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/29/2018. (walk, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Remand Removed Action re #1 Notice of Removal by Ashley Knapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Remand). (Tucker, Tamara). Modified docket entry on 11/28/2018. (walk, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint to #1 First Amended Complaint by Zoetis Inc.. (Gladstone, Michael). Modified docket enrty on 11/09/2018. (walk, ).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Zoetis Inc. (tjoh, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richmond Circuit Court, case number CL18002445 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6343928.), filed by Zoetis Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit a, #3 Exhibit b, #4 Exhibit c, #5 Exhibit d, #6 Exhibit e)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Zoetis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Knapp
Represented By: Tamara Leigh Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoetis Inc.
Represented By: Michael Harper Gladstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?