Artis v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Lavon Artis
Defendant: Capt. Maye, K. Thomas and Warden Beale
Case Number: 3:2018cv00795
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee. It is ORDERED that within eleven (11) days, Plaintiff must submit an initial partial filing fee of $29.96 or state under penalty of perjury that he does not have sufficient assets to pay such a fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). 2. Plaintiff remains liable for the entire filing fee of $350.00. The Court will contact Plaintiff's place of incarceration. The institution will then forward to the Court twenty percent (20%) of all deposits into Plaintiff's account until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 01/07/2019. Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(ccol, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Consent to Collection of Fees by Brandon Lavon Artis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Lavon Artis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope) (smej, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Lavon Artis. (smej, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Lavon Artis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (smej, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Consent to Collection of Fees by Brandon Lavon Artis. (smej, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #1 Envelope) (smej, ).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/28/2018. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Lavon Artis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Doc, #2 Envelope)(ccol, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Lavon Artis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Supporting Doc., #11 Envelope)(ccol, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artis v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lavon Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Beale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?