Jones v. Colonial Heights/Chesterfield Crime Solvers
Plaintiff: Justin L. Jones
Defendant: Michelle C. Wilson and Colonial Heights/Chesterfield Crime Solvers
Case Number: 3:2018cv00823
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER. The Court failed to include a notice to the plaintiff of any appeal rights he might have. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the Order and enters this Amended Order in its place. The Court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff advised of right to appeal within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff) (smej, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (VACATED PER ORDER #8 ) ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. On December 3, 2018, the Court ordered the plaintiff to explain why the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over his case. (Dk. No. #4 .) The plaintiff has not complied with that Order. As the Court previously explained, federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction. They can only hear cases that present a federal question, 28 U.S.C. 1331, and cases for over $75,000 that arise between citizens of different states, 28 U.S.C. 1332. If a case fits neither of these situations, the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, federal courts have a "duty to inquire, sue sponte, whether a valid basis for jurisdiction exists, and to dismiss the action if no such ground appears." In re Bulldog Trucking, Inc., 141 F.3d 347, 352 (4th Cir. 1998). Here, the plaintiff has not identified, and the Court cannot find, a valid basis for either federal question or diversity jurisdiction. Because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the Court DISMISSES this caseWITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/26/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, ) Modified docket text on 12/27/2018 (smej, ).
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Justin L. Jones as to Michelle C. Wilson, Registered Agent. (Attachment: #1 Letter from Plaintiff). (walk, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Justin L. Jones against Colonial Heights/Chesterfield Crime Solvers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E (6 Pages) and #2 Local 83.1(M) Certification Form). (walk, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. On November 28, 2018, the plaintiff filed a complaint against Michelle C. Wilson. Federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction. They can only hear cases that present a federal question, 28 U.S.C. 1331, and cases for over $75,000 that arise between citizens of different states, 28 U.S.C. 1332. If a case fits neither of these situations, the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, federal courts have a "duty to inquire, sue sponte, whether a valid basis for jurisdiction exists, and to dismiss the action if no such ground appears." In re Bulldog Trucking, Inc., 147 F.3d 347,352 (4th Cir. 1998). The Court, therefore, DIRECTS the plaintiff to identify why this Court has either federal question or diversity jurisdiction over his case within fourteen (14) days of this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/03/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from the Clerk mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michelle C. Wilson; Plaintiff provided with a copy of Rule 4. (walk, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Justin L. Jones against Michelle C. Wilson. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 34683042139). (Attachments: #1 Unmarked Exhibits and #2 Receipt). (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Colonial Heights/Chesterfield Crime Solvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Heights/Chesterfield Crime Solvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?