ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Allen Esq. et al

Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Tuckahoe Funding, LLC, S. Page Allen & Associates, P.C., S. Page Allen Esq. and Lindsay Passmore
Case Number: 3:2018cv00843
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that 1. The #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and, 2. Defendants S. Page Allen, Esq.; S. Page Allen & Associates, P.C.; Lindsey Passmore; and Tuckahoe Funding, LLC shall have an extension of time to and including March 19, 2019, fourteen (14) days after the Mediation, to file their respective responses to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 01/15/2019. (walk, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendants by Tuckahoe Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bayliss, William)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Lindsay Passmore Waiver sent on 12/07/2018, Answer due 02/05/2019. (Attachment: #1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. S. Page Allen & Associates, P.C. Waiver sent on 12/07/2018, Answer due 02/05/2019. (Attachment: #1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. S. Page Allen Esq. Waiver sent on 12/07/2018, Answer due 02/05/2019. (Attachment: #1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Tuckahoe Funding, LLC waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(tjoh, )
December 6, 2018 Notice of Correction re: Document #1 ; for all future civil case filings, the filing user is requested to include the case number with the Initial Pleading before filing it and to avoid using all caps when typing a party's name. (walk, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Baird, Timothy)
December 6, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (walk, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company against S. Page Allen, Esq., S. Page Allen & Associates, P.C., Lindsey Passmore and Tuckahoe Funding, LLC. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6394964). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet and #5 Letter). (Baird, Timothy). Modified docket entry on 12/06/2018 and regenerated NEF. (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Allen Esq. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuckahoe Funding, LLC
Represented By: William Delaney Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Page Allen & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Page Allen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Stephen Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?