Knight et al v. Jeld-Wen, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Prusky, Andrew Knight, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Margaret Preece, Julie Whalen, Chris Best, Melanie Lopez, Nigel Gay, Gregory Allen Reitmeyer, Larry Day Fox, Justin Verschoore, Jane E. Swim, Robyn Adler, Gary Bendickson, Elliott Massey, Thomas J. Riley, Twin City Development, LLC, Geoff Hurdle, Trinidad Corona and Wally Bloss
Defendant: Masonite Corporation, Jeld-Wen, Inc. and Kenneth Dallamora
Consolidated Plaintiff: Craig Weitz and Allison Dellatore
Case Number: 3:2018cv00850
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 59 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Twin City Development, LLC. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 6, 2019 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE in Support re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Andrew M. Rink)(Schaeffer, Seth) Modified to correct docket text on 2/7/2019 (smej, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Masonite Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fowler, Calvin)
February 1, 2019 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) against Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Nigel Gay, Larry Day Fox, Melanie Lopez, Chris Best, Thomas J. Riley, Geoff Hurdle, Robyn Adler, Elliott Massey, Trinidad Corona, Gregory Allen Reitmeyer, Gary Bendickson, Jane E. Swim, Twin City Development, LLC, Wally Bloss, Margaret Preece, Justin Verschoore, Julie Whalen, filed by Nigel Gay, Larry Day Fox, Melanie Lopez, Chris Best, Thomas J. Riley, Geoff Hurdle, Robyn Adler, Elliott Massey, Trinidad Corona, Gregory Allen Reitmeyer, Gary Bendickson, Jane E. Swim, Twin City Development, LLC, Wally Bloss, Kenneth Dallamora, Margaret Preece, Justin Verschoore, Julie Whalen.(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 31, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky and Sawbill Companies, Inc. for the Admission of Daniel E. Gustafson, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/25/2019. (walk, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 53 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Elvin Gustafson and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6460593. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Eric Mackie to appear as Pro hac vice for Masonite Corporation. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Nathan Phillip Eimer to appear as Pro hac vice for Masonite Corporation. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Katherine R. Katz to appear as Pro hac vice for Jeld-Wen, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Craig Scott Primis to appear as Pro hac vice for Jeld-Wen, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, ) Modified to correct party being represented on 1/23/2019. NEF regenerated (smej, ).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Benjamin Edward Waldin to appear as Pro hac vice for Masonite Corporation. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Vanessa Jacobsen to appear as Pro hac vice for Masonite Corporation. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/22/2019. (smej, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 46 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E. Waldin and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn K. Brugh Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6454195. by Masonite Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 45 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Mackie and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn K. Brugh Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6454188. by Masonite Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 44 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Vanessa Jacobsen and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn K. Brugh Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6454178. by Masonite Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 43 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan P. Eimer and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn K. Brugh Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6454167. by Masonite Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Support re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schaeffer, Seth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Masonite Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fowler, Calvin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Masonite Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Calvin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 39 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Masonite Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
January 17, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan David O'Toole on behalf of Masonite Corporation (O'Toole, Brendan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Albert Crapanzano, II on behalf of Masonite Corporation (Crapanzano, Gregory)
January 17, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV on behalf of Masonite Corporation (Brugh, Lynn)
January 17, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Wooding Fowler, Jr on behalf of Masonite Corporation (Fowler, Calvin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 34 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine R. Katz and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Giles Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6450917. by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. (Giles, Nicholas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig Scott Primis and Certification of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Giles Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6450902. by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. (Giles, Nicholas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Giles on behalf of Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Giles, Nicholas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Abram Schaeffer on behalf of Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Schaeffer, Seth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Riopelle on behalf of Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Riopelle, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cullen on behalf of Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Cullen, Richard)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.:Conference Call held on 1/14/2019. (wtuc)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. For discovery purposes only, the Court CONSOLIDATES the lead direct purchaser action, In re: Interior Molded Doors Antitrust Litigation (No. 3:18-cv-718), with the lead indirect purchaser action, In re: Interior Molded Doors Indirect Purchaser Antitrust Litigation (No. 3:18-cv-850). The parties shall hold their Rule 26(f) conference within 21 days of this Order. The defendants may file a motion to transfer venue by January 18, 2019. By February 1, 2019, the indirect purchaser plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Class Action Complaint. By March 1, 2019, the defendants shall move to dismiss the direct purchaser plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint and the indirect purchaser plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. By April 1, 2019, the direct purchaser plaintiffs and indirect purchaser plaintiffs shall respond to the motions to dismiss. By April 22, 2019, the defendants shall file their reply to the plaintiffs' response. See Order for other details and deadlines. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 1/14/2019. (jsmi, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/10/2019. (smej, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Brian Douglas Penny as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/09/2019. (smej, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6438274. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 9, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Douglas Penny and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6437640. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Joshua Heath Grabar to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/08/2019. (smej, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Marc Howard Edelson to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/08/2019. (smej, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeld-Wen, Inc. served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019; Masonite Corporation served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (smej, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Heath Grabar and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6434667. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Howard Edelson and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6434425. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Michelle J Looby to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (smej, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Daniel Charles Hedlund to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (smej, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Kyla Gibboney to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (smej, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Steven Noel Williams to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (smej, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Joseph R Saveri to appear as Pro hac vice for Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, and Sawbill Companies, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (smej, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle Jean Looby and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6428315. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Charles Hedlund and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6428307. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyla Jenny Gibboney and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6428293. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Noel Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6428288. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Richard Saveri and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6428258. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER (please see Scheduling Order for additional information); CONSOLIDATION AND COORDINATION OF ACTIONS that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the Court DIRECTS the above-captioned actions to be consolidated for all pre-trial and trial proceedings (please see Order for additional information.); and, PRELIMINARY SCHEDULE OF PROCEEDINGS that within 14 days of appointment of Interim Co-Lead counsel for the proposed Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs class or the consolidation of the two above-referenced cases, whichever is earlier, the parties shall meet and confer on a proposed preliminary schedule of proceedings, including the filing of a consolidated complaint. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Defendants shall not be required to respond to the Dellatore or Knight complaints prior to entry of a preliminary schedule of proceedings. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/26/2018. (walk, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum of Law In Support re: #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Entry of Order filed by Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shumadine, Conrad). Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (sbea, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Entry of Order by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad). Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (sbea, ). Modified on 2/8/2019 (smej, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeld-Wen, Inc. and Masonite Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (smej, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint issued to Masonite Corporation by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint issued to JELD-WEN, Inc. by Andrew Knight, Benjamin Prusky, Sawbill Companies, Inc.. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6401603), filed by Andrew Knight, Sawbill Companies, Inc., Benjamin Prusky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shumadine, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight et al v. Jeld-Wen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonite Corporation
Represented By: Calvin Wooding Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Albert Crapanzano, II
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Waldin
Represented By: Eric Mackie
Represented By: Brendan David O'Toole
Represented By: Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV
Represented By: Nathan Phillip Eimer
Represented By: Vanessa Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeld-Wen, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine R. Katz
Represented By: Brian Charles Riopelle
Represented By: Seth Abram Schaeffer
Represented By: Nicholas James Giles
Represented By: Richard Cullen
Represented By: Craig Scott Primis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Dallamora
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Prusky
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Represented By: Daniel Charles Hedlund
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Joseph R Saveri
Represented By: Kyla Gibboney
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Daniel Elvin Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Knight
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Represented By: Marc Howard Edelson
Represented By: Daniel Charles Hedlund
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Joseph R Saveri
Represented By: Kyla Gibboney
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Joshua Heath Grabar
Represented By: Daniel Elvin Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawbill Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Represented By: Daniel Charles Hedlund
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Joseph R Saveri
Represented By: Kyla Gibboney
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Daniel Elvin Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Preece
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Whalen
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Best
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Lopez
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel Gay
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Allen Reitmeyer
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Day Fox
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Verschoore
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E. Swim
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Adler
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bendickson
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Massey
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Riley
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Development, LLC
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Hurdle
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinidad Corona
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wally Bloss
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Craig Weitz
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: William Reiss
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Allison Dellatore
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?