KBS, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service, et al
Plaintiff: KBS, Inc.
Defendant: River City Roofing, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Patel Services, LLC, Internal Revenue Service and River City Roofing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00864
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 River City Roofing, LLC ANSWER to Complaint Interpleader and Notice of Removal by River City Roofing, Inc..(Arthur, Jonathan)
February 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
February 1, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Notice Regarding Representation. Filing attorney notified of correct event for future filings. Clerk has corrected docket and added attorney representation for River City Roofing, LLC. (jsmi, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Representation by River City Roofing, Inc. (Arthur, Jonathan)
January 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 2/12/2019 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on S. Sadiq Gill's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant River City Roofing, Inc. (ECF No. #6 ). Counsel indicates that he no longer represents River City Roofing. Therefore, it appearing appropriate to do so, the Motion is GRANTED. S. Sadiq Gill is relieved as counsel in this matter. However, Mr. Gill is DIRECTED to notify Defendant River City Roofing of the date and time of the Initial Pretrial Conference so that new counsel may enter an appearance prior to the Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for February 7, 2019 is hereby RESCHEDULED to February 12, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 01/25/2019. (walk, )
January 17, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #6 ; the filing user is notified that the filing event, Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, should have been selected. The docket entry has been corrected and no further action is required at this time. (walk, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by River City Roofing, Inc. (Gill, S.). Corrected docket entry on 01/17/2019. (walk, ).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 9:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
January 8, 2019 Notice of Correction: the Clerk has corrected the docket to show that Christopher Malone of Thompson McMullan PC is not counsel of record and has not made any Notice of Appearance for Patel Services, LLC. (Documents previously filed listed Christopher Malone as Registered Agent for Patel Services, LLC). (jtho, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: State Court Records received from Richmond General District Court. (Attachments: #1 Case No: GV18033210, #2 Case No: GV18040106)(tjoh, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Representation by Thompson McMullan, P.C., Christopher M. Malone (Matheson, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Amended Notice of Removal filed by United States of America (Formerly Case. No. GV18040106-00 filed in the Richmond City General District Court.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). (Carter, Kieran). Modified docket entry on 12/18/2018. (walk, ).
December 17, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #1 Notice of Removal; Clerk notified AUSA Hambrick of correct procedures for submitting the Notice of Removal. Clerk has corrected the Cause of Action, included the Civil Action Number on the Notice of Removal, and also updated the information regarding the parties. No further action is required at this time. (sbea, )
December 14, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (sbea, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Carter, Kieran). Clerk replaced Notice of Remove to include Civil Action Number on 12/17/2018. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/17/2018 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KBS, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Roofing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patel Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Roofing, Inc.
Represented By: S. Sadiq Gill
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBS, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Jeanne Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?