Shree Arihant of PG, Inc. v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Shree Arihant of PG, Inc.
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company and National Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00882
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Simpson Garrett on behalf of National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company (Garrett, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the plaintiff shall assure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than February 18, 2019, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. February 20, 2019 whether such consents (by all parties) have been given; and, to avoid confusion, counsel for each party shall file, not later than 5:00 p.m. February 20, 2019 a Statement Respecting Consent wherein the position of the party (whether consenting or not) shall be clearly set forth. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/4/2019. (sbea, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/28/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2019 at 11:15 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 01/28/2019. (nbrow)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Shree Arihant of PG, Inc.. (Brown, C.)
December 21, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 , #4 Corporate Disclosure Statements; Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for submitting a Notice of Removal. Clerk has made the corrections and no further action is required at this time. (sbea, )
December 21, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by National Indemnity Company (Friedman, Robert). Clerk replaced document to include Civil Action Number on 12/21/2018). NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (sbea, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Friedman, Robert). Clerk replaced document to include Civil Action Number on 12/21/2018. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (sbea, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company (Friedman, Robert). Clerk replaced document to include Civil Action Number on 12/21/2018. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/21/2018. (sbea, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6418803), filed by National Indemnity Company, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Notice of Filing Removal)(Friedman, Robert). Clerk replaced Notice of Removal to include Civil Action Number on 12/21/2018. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/21/2018 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shree Arihant of PG, Inc. v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Forest Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Simpson Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert Forest Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Simpson Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shree Arihant of PG, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Brown
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?