First National Bank of Pennsylvania v. Fun Tours, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: First National Bank of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Sharon Kushnir, Felix Jacob Kushnir and Fun Tours, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00898
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Additional Return on Summons by First National Bank of Pennsylvania as to Fun Tours, Inc. (walk, )
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FELIX KUSHNIR AND SHARON KUSHNIR TO REPOND TO PETITION. The deadline for Defendants, Felix Kushnir and Sharon Kushnir to respond to the FNB's Petition for Detinue, Possession, and Sale of Secured Property and Money Judgment is extended to February 27,2019. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/31/2019. (jsmi, )
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT JUDGMENT ORDER AS TO FUN TOURS. INC. FNB is granted a money judgment against Fun Tours: (a) in the amount of $2,696,275.72 with interest at the rate of 8% per annum from December 17, 2018, until paid, on the principal balance of $2,446,313.42, plus reasonable attorneys' fees and costs as provided for by law and (b) in the amount of $254,564.57 with interest at the rate of 8%, per annum from December 17, 2018, until paid, on the principal amount of $230,492.14 plus reasonable attorneys' fees and costs as provided for by law. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/31/2019. (jsmi, ) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/31/2019) (jsmi, ).
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time for Felix and Sharon Kushnir to Respond to Petition)(Hester, Clay)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Entry of Consent Judgment Order by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Judgment Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Consent Judgment Order)(Hester, Clay)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Fun Tours, Inc. served on 1/3/2019; Felix Jacob Kushnir served on 1/4/2019; Sharon Kushnir served on 1/4/2019. (jsmi, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to respond to the FNB's Petition for Detinue, Possession, and Sale of Secured Property and Money Judgment is extended to January 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/25/2019. (jsmi, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hester, Clay)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
January 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hester, Clay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Hester, Clay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Hester, Clay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint,, by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Hester, Clay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6424516.), filed by First National Bank of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Hester, Clay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Bank of Pennsylvania v. Fun Tours, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Kushnir
Represented By: Alan David Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Jacob Kushnir
Represented By: Alan David Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun Tours, Inc.
Represented By: Alan David Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Bank of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Clay Sutton Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?