Intercept Youth Services, Inc. v. Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Intercept Youth Services, Inc.
Defendant: Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00901
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Intervenor's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit Intervenor's Complaint Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Intervenor's Complaint Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Intervenor's Complaint Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Intervenor's Complaint Exhibit 4)(Manuel, Elisabeth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Intercept Youth Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rasmussen, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (cgar)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Intercept Youth Services, Inc.. (Rasmussen, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Intercept Youth Services, Inc.. (Rasmussen, John)
January 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6425284.), filed by Intercept Youth Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rasmussen, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intercept Youth Services, Inc. v. Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Risk Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercept Youth Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Janney Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Elisabeth L. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?