Kreer v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Emily Kreer
Defendant: Adrian S. Taylor and CT Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/07/2019. (nbrow)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S 73 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/6/2019. (jsmi, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that ADRIAN S. TAYLOR'S AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC'S #8 MOTION TO BIFURCATE is denied. It is further ORDERED that the facts and legal contentions are adequately presented in the materials before the Court and oral argument would not aid the decisional process. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/5/2019. (jsmi, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Discovery Plan by CT Transportation, LLC.(Frankl, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 26 Disclosure by Emily Kreer. (Krol, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Bifurcate by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Adrian S. Taylor. (Frankl, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Demurrer filed in the state court (EOF No. 1-1 (DEMURRER AND ANSWER OF ADRIAN S. TAYLOR AND CT TRANSPORTATION, LLC)) is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion on the same topic pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) with accompanying briefs. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/2019. (jsmi, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Krol on behalf of Emily Kreer (Krol, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Motion for Consolidation and a separate Motion for Bifurcation shall be filed and briefed on the following schedule: motions filed separately by the defendants on January 25, 2019; plaintiffs' responses to each motion shall be filed on February 11, 2019; and defendants' shall file their replies in support of the motions. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/16/2019. (jsmi, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CT Transportation, LLC. (Frankl, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6445007.), filed by Adrian S. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Frankl, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreer v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian S. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Frankl
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Frankl
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Kreer
Represented By: Emmet Dwayne Alexander
Represented By: Michael Robert Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?