Skochin et al v. Genworth Financial, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Skochin, Larry Huber and Susan Skochin
Defendant: Genworth Life Insurance Company and Genworth Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00049
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company.(Siegmund, Heidi)
March 12, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Gary Meyerhoff by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Siegmund, Heidi)
March 12, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Siegmund, Heidi)
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Siegmund, Heidi)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Reid Lawrence Ashinoff to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Genworth Financial, Inc. and Genworth Life Insurance Company. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/7/2019. (sbea, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Gary Meyerhoff to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Genworth Financial, Inc. and Genworth Life Insurance Company. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/7/2019. (sbea, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Reid Lawrence Ashinoff and Certification of Local Counsel Brian E. Pumphrey Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6515505. by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Pumphrey, Brian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary Meyerhoff and Certification of Local Counsel Brian E. Pumphrey Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6515450. by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Pumphrey, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Siegmund, Heidi)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Genworth Financial, Inc. answer due 3/12/2019; Genworth Life Insurance Company answer due 3/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 02/12/2019. (tjoh, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Charles Riopelle on behalf of Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company (Riopelle, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan David Frei on behalf of Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company (Frei, Ryan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Emory Pumphrey on behalf of Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company (Pumphrey, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Genworth Financial, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Heidi). Modified docket text on 2/7/2019 (sbea, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Genworth Financial, Inc. served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; and Genworth Life Insurance Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (ccol, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Brian Douglas Penny to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin, and Larry Huber. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/25/2019. (sbea, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Bradley Mathew Beall to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin, and Larry Huber. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/25/2019. (sbea, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stuart Andrew Davidson to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin, and Larry Huber. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/25/2019. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A). (sbea, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher Chagas Gold to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin, and Larry Huber. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/25/2019. (sbea, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Genworth Financial, Inc. and Genworth Life Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove headers and print out two copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and one copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons for each Defendant (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Douglas Penny, Esq. and Certification of Local Counsel Brielle M. Hunt, Esq Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456567. by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Hunt, Brielle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley Mathew Beall, Esq. and Certification of Local Counsel Brielle M. Hunt, Esq. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456499. by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Hunt, Brielle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Andrew Davidson, Esq. and Certification of Local Counsel Brielle M. Hunt, Esq. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456491. by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hunt, Brielle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Chagas Gold, Esq. and Certification of Local Counsel Brielle M. Hunt, Esq. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456482. by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Hunt, Brielle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brielle Marie Hunt on behalf of Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin (Hunt, Brielle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, as to Genworth Life Insurance Company by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Phelan, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, as to Genworth Financial, Inc. by Larry Huber, Jerome Skochin, Susan Skochin. (Phelan, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #1 Class Action Complaint; Clerk notified filing attorney of correct filing procedures for filing the initial complaint. Clerk has requested that the filing attorney file the "Proposed Summons" as a separate docket entry. Clerk has made the corrections and no further action is required at this time. (sbea, )
January 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6453735), filed by Jerome Skochin, Larry Huber, Susan Skochin. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Petty, Jonathan). Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number on 1/18/2019. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 1/18/2019 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skochin et al v. Genworth Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Skochin
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Represented By: Jonathan Monroe Petty
Represented By: Bradley Mathew Beall
Represented By: Brielle Marie Hunt
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Huber
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Represented By: Jonathan Monroe Petty
Represented By: Bradley Mathew Beall
Represented By: Brielle Marie Hunt
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Skochin
Represented By: Michael G. Phelan
Represented By: Jonathan Monroe Petty
Represented By: Bradley Mathew Beall
Represented By: Brielle Marie Hunt
Represented By: Brian Douglas Penny
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genworth Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Represented By: Brian Charles Riopelle
Represented By: Ryan David Frei
Represented By: Reid Lawrence Ashinoff
Represented By: Gary Meyerhoff
Represented By: Brian Emory Pumphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genworth Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Represented By: Brian Charles Riopelle
Represented By: Ryan David Frei
Represented By: Reid Lawrence Ashinoff
Represented By: Gary Meyerhoff
Represented By: Brian Emory Pumphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?