Odemns v. Chanler

Plaintiff: Steven Vincent Odemns
Defendant: Nicole Willis Chanler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00072
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #3 Consent MOTION for Discovery of Tax Records; Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for submitting a Proposed Order with original signatures. Attorney was requested to either mail the Order to the Clerk's Office or file over the counter. (sbea, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Discovery of Tax Records by Nicole Willis Chanler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jebo, James)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/24/2019 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rescheduled from 4/10/2019) (rpiz)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 9:25 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
February 6, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #1 Notice of Removal; Clerk has corrected the defendant's name on the Docket Report as the first and last name were transposed, the Cause was changed to Notice of Removal - Personal Injury rather than Diversity - Personal Injury. Clerk also corrected the demand amount. No further action is required at this time. (sbea, )
February 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (sbea, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6480451), filed by Chanler Nicole Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint, #4 Service paper, #5 Answer, #6 Notice of Filing Removal)(Jebo, James). Modified docket text on 2/6/2019 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odemns v. Chanler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vincent Odemns
Represented By: Stephen Vaughan Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Willis Chanler
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?