Bennett v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jerome Bennett
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00082
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1) Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment with a brief in support thereof not later than thirty (30) days from the date that this ORDER is entered into the docket. 2) Defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment with brief in support thereof, including a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, not later than sixty (60) days from the date this ORDER is entered into the docket. 3) Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date Defendant's motion for summary judgment is entered into the docket to file any Reply. 4) The Clerk is directed to provide the parties with the Notice, Consent and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by the United States Magistrate Judge. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 4/8/2019. (Attachment: #1 Notice, Consent and Order of Reference). (sbea, )
April 5, 2019 Certified Administrative Record; filed UNDER SEAL Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(c)(1); placed on the shelf in the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Hambrick, Jonathan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (smej, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 02/26/2019. (smej, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (smej, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: (BEFORE PRINTING SUMMONS PLEASE REMOVE HEADER ON THE TOP OF PAGES). Print out two ELECTRONICALLY issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorneys Office, #2 Acting Attorney General)(ccol, )
February 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (ccol, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jerome Bennett. (Brooks, Edwin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jerome Bennett. (Brooks, Edwin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jerome Bennett. (Brooks, Edwin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Jerome Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Edwin)
February 8, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - by Jerome Bennett. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6484518.. (Brooks, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Bennett
Represented By: Edwin Frederick Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?