Burton v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Gerard Burton
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00083
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (please see Scheduling Order for additional information.) The Clerk is directed to provide the parties with the Notice, Consent and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by the United States Magistrate Judge. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 04/11/2019. (Attachment: #1 Notice, Consent and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by the United States Magistrate Judge). (walk, )
April 10, 2019 Certified Administrative Record (two volumes); filed UNDER SEAL in the Clerk's Office Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(c)(1). (walk, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Lucier, Jonathan)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (walk, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (walk, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service by Nancy A. Berryhill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 02/13/2019, Answer due 04/15/2019. (walk, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Marshal's Return on Summonses as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for EDVA. (walk, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Virginia; hand-delivered to USMS with USM 285 forms. (walk, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 -1) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) on February 11, 2019, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 02/12/2019. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #1 ; the filing user is requested to file a Civil Cover Sheet as an attachment to a document entitled: Notice of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet. The filing event: Notice Other should be used to file the document. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #1 ; For all future case openings, the filing user is requested to include the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and the Retainer Agreement and Assignment as separate attachments to the Complaint. Please see the corrected Docket Report for additional information. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summonses by Gerard Burton. (Hunter, Horace)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Gerard Burton against Nancy A. Berryhill. (Hunter, Horace). Additional attachments added on 02/11/2019: #1 Motion and Affidavit to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and #2 Retainer Agreement and Assignment). (walk, ). Corrected docket entry on 02/11/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Burton
Represented By: Horace Frazier Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?