Gregory v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Angela Gregory
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (walk, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (walk, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by Nancy A. Berryhill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 02/13/2019, Answer due 04/15/2019. (walk, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Marshal's Return on Summonses as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for EDVA. (walk, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Virginia; hand-delivered to USMS with USM 285 forms. (walk, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 -3) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) on February 11, 2019, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Novak on 02/12/2019. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (walk, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Oral Argument by Angela Gregory. (Krumbein, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summonses re: #1 Complaint by Angela Gregory. (Krumbein, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum filed by Angela Gregory against Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis). (Krumbein, Charles). Modified docket entry on 02/11/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gregory
Represented By: Charles H. Krumbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?