Jones v. West End Operations LLC et al
Plaintiff: Judith W Jones
Defendant: Care Virginia Management LLC and West End Operations LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00107
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Settlement Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. (mful)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on July 9, 2019 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 04/16/2019. (tjoh, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/10/2019) (rpiz)
April 10, 2019 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/10/2019 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
April 10, 2019 Case referred to Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young for settlement purposes. (tjoh, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Settlement Conference Referral) It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by section 1(E)(1) of Pretrial Schedule A are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers ofMagistrate Judge Young within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference, which should occur at least thirty (30) days before the start of trial and at such time as Magistrate Judge Young shall approve. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 04/10/2019. (tjoh, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Judith W Jones, Willie Pressley, Jr. It is ORDERED that defendant CARE VIRGINIA MANAGEMENT, LLC, d/b/a Care Virginia and d/b/a Glenburnie Rehabilitation and Nursing Center is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action and COUNT I of the Complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 03/26/2019. (tjoh, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal for CARE VIRGINIA MANAGEMENT, LLC and Count I of Complaint by Judith W Jones, Willie Pressley, Jr. (Hutchens, Suzette)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 9:35 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
February 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Care Virginia Management LLC, West End Operations LLC (Schnetzler, Nathan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West End Operations LLC. (Londos, Katherine)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Care Virginia Management LLC. (Londos, Katherine)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Care Virginia Management LLC, West End Operations LLC.(Londos, Katherine)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6500359.), filed by West End Operations LLC, Care Virginia Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Londos, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. West End Operations LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith W Jones
Represented By: Suzette Lynn Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Virginia Management LLC
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Katherine C. Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West End Operations LLC
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Katherine C. Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?