UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kendall et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Rhonda Traylor and Alonzo Kendall
Case Number: 3:2019cv00378
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Alonzo Kendall served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 (Carter, Kieran) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/2/2019) (jsmi, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Rhonda Traylor served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Carter, Kieran) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/2/2019) (jsmi, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hambrick, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Notice of Correction re #3 Summons Returned Executed. Answer deadline cancelled and Summons reissued per Plaintiff's counsel request. (jsmi, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Alonzo Kendall per counsel request - see attached letter. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (jsmi, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Amended to Correct District Court Location) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Carter, Kieran)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISREGARD - SUMMONS REISSUED. SEE #5 . SUMMONS Returned Executed. Alonzo Kendall served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019 (Carter, Kieran) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/4/2019) (jsmi, ). Modified on 6/21/2019 (jsmi, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alonzo Kendall and Rhonda Traylor. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Alonzo Kendall, #3 Proposed Summons - Rhonda Traylor)(Carter, Kieran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?