Hauge et al v. Community Realty Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Liv Hauge and Kenneth Hauge
Defendant: Spencer Fried, Kimberly Zylka, Tanita Kearse, Community Realty Company, Inc., The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC and Douglas Erdman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00379
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by Kimberly Zylka.(Morris, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC.(Morris, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Tanita Kearse.(Morris, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Spencer Fried.(Morris, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas Erdman.(Morris, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint by Community Realty Company, Inc..(Morris, Donald)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Community Realty Company, Inc. substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Douglas Erdman substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Tanita Kearse substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Spencer Fried substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Kimberly Zylka substitutes Gwynne L. Booth, Esq. as counsel of record in place of James D. Sadowski, Esq. So ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/24/19. (jsau, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Edward Morris on behalf of Community Realty Company, Inc., Douglas Erdman, Spencer Fried, Tanita Kearse, The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC, Kimberly Zylka (Morris, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Douglas Erdman served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019, by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge (Schronce, Johnathon) Modified docket text on 6/12/2019 (jsau, ).
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Community Realty Company, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019, by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge (Schronce, Johnathon) Modified docket text on 6/12/2019 (jsau, ).
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwynne Lynn Booth on behalf of Community Realty Company, Inc., Douglas Erdman, Spencer Fried, Tanita Kearse, The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC, Kimberly Zylka (Booth, Gwynne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge Spencer Fried served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Schronce, Johnathon)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 So Ordered. Defendants shall have up to and including July 10, 2019, to respond to the complaint in this action. re: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Tanita Kearse, Community Realty Company, Inc., The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC, Spencer Fried, Kimberly Zylka, Douglas Erdman. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/10/19. (jsau, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge Kimberly Zylka served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (Schronce, Johnathon)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Community Realty Company, Inc., Douglas Erdman, Spencer Fried, Tanita Kearse, The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC, Kimberly Zylka. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sadowski, James) Modified docket text on 6/10/2019 (jsau, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Community Realty Company, Inc., The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC. (Sadowski, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Sadowski on behalf of Community Realty Company, Inc., Douglas Erdman, Spencer Fried, Tanita Kearse, The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC, Kimberly Zylka (Sadowski, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (jsau, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on The Evergreens at Smith Run on 05/23/2019, filed by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon) Modified on 6/5/2019 (jsau, ).
June 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #14 Affidavit of Service. Filing attorney notified of correct procedures for filing an executed summons. Clerk has corrected the entry. No further action is required. (jsau, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Lea Elyse Patterson to appear Pro hac vice for Kenneth Hauge and for Liv Hauge. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 5/28/19. (jsau, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jeremiah Grant Dys to appear Pro hac vice for Kenneth Hauge and for Liv Hauge. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 5/28/19. (jsau, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge Tanita Kearse served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019 (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by LEA ELYSE PATTERSON and Certification of Local Counsel Johnathon E. Schronce Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6654950. by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by JEREMIAH GRANT DYS and Certification of Local Counsel Johnathon E. Schronce Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6654942. by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Community Realty Company, Inc., Douglas Erdman, Spencer Fried, Tanita Kearse, The Evergreens at Smith Run, Inc., Kimberly Zylka. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Tanita Kearse by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Spencer Fried by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Kimberly Zylka by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Douglas Erdman by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, The Evergreens at Smith Run, Inc. by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Community Realty Company, Inc. by Kenneth Hauge, Liv Hauge. (Schronce, Johnathon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6650393.), filed by Liv Hauge, Kenneth Hauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A, #2 Exhibit Ex.B, #3 Exhibit Ex.C, #4 Exhibit Ex.D, #5 Exhibit Ex.E, #6 Exhibit Ex.F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Schronce, Johnathon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/21/2019) (jsau, ).
May 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
May 21, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Proposed Summons. Filing Attorney notified of correct filing procedures for proposed summons. (jsau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauge et al v. Community Realty Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Fried
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Zylka
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanita Kearse
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Realty Company, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evergreens at Smith Run, LLC
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Erdman
Represented By: James D. Sadowski
Represented By: Gwynne Lynn Booth
Represented By: Donald Edward Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liv Hauge
Represented By: Elbert Lin
Represented By: Timothy Louis McHugh
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Ramos
Represented By: Eric Harrison Feiler
Represented By: Johnathon Earl Schronce
Represented By: Lea Elyse Patterson
Represented By: Jeremiah Grant Dys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hauge
Represented By: Elbert Lin
Represented By: Timothy Louis McHugh
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Ramos
Represented By: Eric Harrison Feiler
Represented By: Johnathon Earl Schronce
Represented By: Lea Elyse Patterson
Represented By: Jeremiah Grant Dys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?