Corbin v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roger P. Corbin
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00391
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roger P. Corbin. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Schulte, Tim) Modified to correct answer deadline on 7/18/2019 (jsmi, ).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Jennifer Calabrese Bell appointed for Roger P. Corbin. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/15/2019. (jsmi, )
July 12, 2019 Notice of Correction re #3 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney notified of proper filing event and answer deadline set. (jsmi, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Calabrese Bell and Certification of Local Counsel Tim Schulte Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734466. by Roger P. Corbin. (Schulte, Tim)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019 (Schulte, Tim) Modified to correct docket text on 7/12/2019 (jsmi, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
May 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6656563.), filed by Roger P. Corbin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schulte, Tim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin v. Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger P. Corbin
Represented By: Tim Schulte
Represented By: Jennifer Calabrese Bell
Represented By: Blackwell Nixon Shelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?