Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00399
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant, having moved this Court for an extension of time within which to file its answer; Plaintiff having consented to the requested extension; and finding good cause for the requested extension, it is therefore ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension of time up to and including Monday, September 16, 2019, in which to file its answer. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/27/19. (jsau, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
June 12, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 . Filing attorney notified of correct filing procedures when filing a Summons Return. (jsau, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate Reporting Service by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (jsau, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
May 29, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. Filing attorney notified that proposed summonses are needed for the U.S. Attorney as well as the Attorney General. Attorney will submit additional "proposed summons" via email. Clerk will file and prepare summons as requested. (jsau, )
May 29, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6661825.), filed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrou, Douglas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/29/2019) (jsau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Represented By: Douglas McCarley Garrou
Represented By: Robert Dennis Fairbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?