City of Richmond v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Va City Of Richmond and City of Richmond
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Thrifty Payless, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC,, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00404
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Case TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio re: 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-96) re: MDL No. 2804 - In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation. Original case file and public Docket Report sent electronically. (walk, ). (Northern District of Ohio Case No. 1:19op45546). Modified on 6/21/2019 (jtho, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-96) - 15 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted (please see Conditional Transfer Order for additional information.) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/20/2019.
June 20, 2019 MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-96) Finalized on 6/20/19. Please see pleading (5 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4683 in MDL No. 2804, 5 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 5 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 5 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 5 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 5 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 5 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 5 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 5 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 5 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 5 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 5 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 5 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 5 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 6 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. OHIO for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/20/2019. (Walk, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REINSTATING CTO-96 (re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). The stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-96 filed on 6/12/19 is REINSTATED (please see Order Reinstating Stay for additional information.) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019. (walk, )
June 19, 2019 MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-96) Finalized on 6/19/19. Please see pleading (3 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4676 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 3 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 3 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 3 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 3 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 3 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 3 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 3 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 3 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 3 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 3 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 4 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019. (walk, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-96) - 18 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted (please see Conditional Transfer Order for additional information.) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019. (walk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Richmond.(Jacobs, Christopher)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Letter Notifying Court of Plaintiff's Intent to Send Waiver(s) of Service of Summons to the Defendants. (Jacobs, Christopher)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user is requested to submit proposed summonses using the filing event, Proposed Summons or, to notify the Clerk's Office by letter (using the filing event, Letter), if Plaintiff intends to send Waiver(s) of Service of Summons to the Defendants. The filing user is further requested to include all of the proposed summonses in one filing instead of 27 separate filings. Plaintiff is welcome to contact the Clerk's Office if further assistance is needed. (walk, )
May 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by City of Richmond against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6664013). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jacobs, Christopher). Modified docket entry on 05/30/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Richmond v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Va City Of Richmond
Represented By: Christopher Isaac Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Richmond
Represented By: Christopher Isaac Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?