Atlantic Union Bank v. Holt et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Union Bank
Defendant: Patricia R. Holt, Thunderball, her engines, tackle, equipment, and appurtenances, etc., John L. Holt, III and Thunderball
Case Number: 3:2019cv00405
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Cheryl Stewart on behalf of John L. Holt, III, Patricia R. Holt (Stewart, Dawn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings by John L. Holt, III, Patricia R. Holt. (Stewart, Dawn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Union Bank Patricia R. Holt served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 (Musgrave, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atlantic Union Bank John L. Holt, III served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 (Musgrave, David)
July 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re #17 Affidavit, #18 Affidavit: Clerk has notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for service documents. Filing attorney has been instructed to refile the document using the correct docket event. (smej, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 DISREGARD. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Patricia Holt by Atlantic Union Bank. (Musgrave, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (smej, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 DISREGARD. AFFIDAVIT of Service for John Holt by Atlantic Union Bank. (Musgrave, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 (smej, ).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF PUBLICATION - It is by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia: ORDERED, that Plaintiff Atlantic Union Bank shall promptly arrange to have the Richmond Times-Dispatch, a newspaper of general circulation within the Richmond Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, publish the Notice of Arrest and Seizure of Vessel attached as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 06/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Copy placed in USM box) (smej, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Order of Publication by Atlantic Union Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Musgrave, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Marshal's Return as to Thunderball - USM Form. (smej, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel "Thunderball" issued. Hand-delivered four certified copies to USM for service. (Attachments: #1 USM Form) (smej, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Atlantic Union Bank re #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Warrant for Arrest (Proposed) (Musgrave, David)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN - It is by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia: ORDERED, that the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division (the "Marshal"), is authorized and directed to surrender the possession of the Vessel to the Substitute Custodian, HNK of Virginia, Inc. d/b/a Commonwealth Boat Brokers (the "Substitute Custodian"), and that upon such surrender the Marshal be discharged from his duties and responsibilities for the safekeeping of the Vessel and held harmless from any and all claims arising whatsoever out of the substituted possession and safekeeping. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 06/03/2019. (smej, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AUTHORIZING SHIFT OF VESSEL - It is by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia: ORDERED, that the Motion is GRANTED; and is further ORDERED, that the Substitute Custodian, HNK of Virginia, Inc. d/b/a Commonwealth Boat Brokers, is authorized to move the vessel THUNDERBALL (Official No. 569771) (the "Vessel") from its present location at 102 Pembroke Lane, White Stone, Virginia and safely relocate the Vessel to Commonwealth Boat Brokers, 423 South Washington Highway, Ashland, Virginia 23005 or such location within this district as may be safe and appropriate to maintain the Vessel in safekeeping during the pendency of this action. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 06/03/2019. (smej, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR WARRANT TO ARREST - It is by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia: ORDERED, that the Clerk issue a warrant of arrest for the vessel THUNDERBALL (Official No. 569771) pursuant to Supplemental Rule C of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 06/03/2019. (smej, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to John L. Holt, III, Patricia R. Holt. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
May 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (smej, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Patricia R. Holt by Atlantic Union Bank. (Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for John L. Holt, III by Atlantic Union Bank. (Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Atlantic Union Bank. (Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Atlantic Union Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Shift Vessel by Atlantic Union Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant to Arrest Pursuant to Supplemental Rule C by Atlantic Union Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Musgrave, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint in Rem for Foreclosure of Preferred Ship Mortgage and For in Personam Judgment (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6664310), filed by Atlantic Union Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Musgrave, David) Modified on 6/3/2019 (jtho, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Union Bank v. Holt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Union Bank
Represented By: David S. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia R. Holt
Represented By: Dawn Cheryl Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunderball, her engines, tackle, equipment, and appurtenances, etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Holt, III
Represented By: Dawn Cheryl Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunderball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?