Gust v. Virginia Physicians, Inc.
Plaintiff: Renate Gust
Defendant: Virginia Physicians, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00445
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: The Motion #8 is GRANTED, and VPI is ordered to serve its responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/08/2019. (smej, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (joint) by Virginia Physicians, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Upon consideration of the Joint Motion of Defendant Virginia Physicians, Inc. ("VPI") and Plaintiff Renate Gust for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading it is hereby ORDERED that: The Motion #6 is GRANTED, and VPI is ordered to serve its responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before August 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 07/08/2019. (smej, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Virginia Physicians, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia Physicians, Inc.. (Daniel, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly W. Daniel on behalf of Virginia Physicians, Inc. (Daniel, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (smej, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Virginia Physicians, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Renate Gust. (Sarrett, Drew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6695199), filed by Renate Gust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Opt-In and Become Party to Collective Action) (Sarrett, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gust v. Virginia Physicians, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renate Gust
Represented By: Drew David Sarrett
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly W. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?