Clark v. City of Chesapeake, VA Sheriff, et al.

Plaintiff: Eric T. Clark
Defendant: Chesapeake, Virginia Sheriff Office, Jim O'Sullivan, City of Chesapeake, VA Sheriff Office, John Newhart and ABL Management
Case Number: 3:2019cv00454
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff has complied with the prior Memorandum Order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: 1. Within eleven (11) days of the date of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit an initial partial filing fee of $12.37 or state under penalty of perjury that he does not have sufficient assets to pay such a fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1); 2. Plaintiff remains liable for the entire filing fee of $350.00. After Plaintiff pays the initial partial filing fee or it is waived, the Court will contact Plaintiff's place of incarceration. The institution will then forward to the Court twenty percent (20%) of all deposits into Plaintiff's account until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid; and, 3. If Plaintiff is unable or unwilling to comply with any of the above procedures, he may move to voluntarily dismiss the action. If Plaintiff so moves, he will be relieved of the filing fee for the present action. If Plaintiff persists in prosecuting the action or fails to voluntarily dismiss the action within eleven (11) days of the date of entry hereof, he will be responsible for paying the entire filing fee. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 07/24/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent to Collection of Fees by Eric T. Clark. (walk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION and Affidavit in Support to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eric T. Clark. (walk, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Chesapeake City Jail as to Eric T. Clark. (walk, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER that: (1) This action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; (2) Within 30 days, Plaintiff must submit a statement under oath or under penalty of perjury that (please see Memorandum Order for additional information); (3) The Clerk shall obtain a certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for the six month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; (4) Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee. Accordingly, he is required to read, sign, and return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days; and, (5) Failure to comply strictly with any of the above time requirements will result in summary dismissal of the action (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 06/26/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff with Consent to Collections of Fees form and IFP Affidavit. Letter and Inmate Account Report Form mailed to Chesapeake City Jail. (walk ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric T. Clark against City of Chesapeake, VA Sheriff Office, John Newhart, Jim O'Sullivan and ABL Management. (walk, ). Modified docket entry on 06/26/2019. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. City of Chesapeake, VA Sheriff, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric T. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake, Virginia Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chesapeake, VA Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Newhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABL Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?