Clark v. Publisher's Clearing House

Plaintiff: Eric T. Clark
Defendant: Publisher's Clearing House
Case Number: 3:2019cv00456
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric T. Clark. (smej, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Document received from Chesapeake Sheriff's Department (see page 3). (tjoh, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff to submit partial filing fee of $12.37 within eleven (11) days of entry hereof and remains liable for the entire fee; Court to contact institution within twenty (20) days to forward 20 percent of all deposits until $350.00 fee is paid; Plaintiff may move to voluntarily dismiss within eleven (11) days or he/she will be responsible for entire fee. See Order for more details. Copies mailed: Yes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 07/24/2019. (tjoh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric T. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tjoh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Collection of Fees by Eric T. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tjoh, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Chesapeake City Jail as to Eric T. Clark. (walk, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 06/26/2019. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric T. Clark against Publisher's Clearing House. (Attachment: #1 Unmarked Attachment). (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Publisher's Clearing House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric T. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publisher's Clearing House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?