Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Kaleo Inc.
Plaintiff: Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Kaleo Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00464
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark. (walk, ).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #7 ) filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). It appearing appropriate to do so, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/19/2019. (walk, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Eldridge, Amy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation Kaleo Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 (Eldridge, Amy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corrected Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark. (walk, ). Modified docket entry on 06/25/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ). Corrected docket entry on 07/22/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kaleo Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
June 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Eldridge, Amy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Eldridge, Amy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation against Kaleo, Inc. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6705105). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Eldridge, Amy). Modified docket entry on 06/24/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Kaleo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adamis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Amy Jo Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?