Galloway et al v. Williams, Jr et al

Plaintiff: Burry Pough, Kevin Minor, Linda Madison, Renee Galloway, Anastasia Sherman, Dianne Turner, Derek Geter, Andrea Scarborough, Sharon Paavo, Rose Marie Buchert, Regina Nolte, Faith Thomas, Latanya Tarleton, Keisha Hamm, Lori Fitzgerald, Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Anthony Green, Lucinda Gray, Dominique de la Bay, Sonji Grandy, Teresa Titus and Lisa Martinez
Defendant: Alice Brunk, James Williams, Jr, June Saad, Henry Smith, Andrea Russell, Tina Caron, Roberta Ivey, Mitchell McGeshick, Jeffery McGeshick and Michelle Hazen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00470
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance by Burry Pough, Faith Thomas, Rose Marie Buchert, Dianne Turner, Anthony Green, Sharon Paavo, Renee Galloway, Linda Madison, Latanya Tarleton, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Earl Browne, Dominique de la Bay, Kevin Minor, Lisa Martinez, Jerry Avent, Keisha Hamm, Anastasia Sherman, Regina Nolte, Lori Fitzgerald, Teresa Titus, Derek Geter, Andrea Scarborough. Alice Brunk served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Tina Caron served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Michelle Hazen served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Roberta Ivey served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Jeffery McGeshick served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Mitchell McGeshick served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Andrea Russell served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; June Saad served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; Henry Smith served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019; James Williams, Jr served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (tjoh, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Eleanor Michelle Drake to appear as Pro hac vice for Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Lori Fitzgerald, Renee Galloway, Derek Geter, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Anthony Green, Keisha Hamm, Linda Madison, Lisa Martinez, Kevin Minor, Regina Nolte, Sharon Paavo, Burry Pough, Andrea Scarborough, Anastasia Sherman, Latanya Tarleton, Faith Thomas, Teresa Titus, Dianne Turner, and Dominique de la Bay. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 07/11/2019. (smej, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for to appear as Pro hac vice for Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Lori Fitzgerald, Renee Galloway, Derek Geter, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Anthony Green, Keisha Hamm, Linda Madison, Lisa Martinez, Kevin Minor, Regina Nolte, Sharon Paavo, Burry Pough, Andrea Scarborough, Anastasia Sherman, Latanya Tarleton, Faith Thomas, Teresa Titus, Dianne Turner, and Dominique de la Bay. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 07/11/2019. (smej, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Gerard Albanese and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C Marchiando Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6729746. by Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Lori Fitzgerald, Renee Galloway, Derek Geter, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Anthony Green, Keisha Hamm, Linda Madison, Lisa Martinez, Kevin Minor, Regina Nolte, Sharon Paavo, Burry Pough, Andrea Scarborough, Anastasia Sherman, Latanya Tarleton, Faith Thomas, Teresa Titus, Dianne Turner, Dominique de la Bay. (Marchiando, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eleanor Michelle Drake and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C Marchiando Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6729739. by Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Lori Fitzgerald, Renee Galloway, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Anthony Green, Keisha Hamm, Linda Madison, Lisa Martinez, Kevin Minor, Regina Nolte, Sharon Paavo, Burry Pough, Andrea Scarborough, Anastasia Sherman, Latanya Tarleton, Faith Thomas, Teresa Titus, Dianne Turner, Dominique de la Bay. (Marchiando, Craig)
June 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alice Brunk, Tina Caron, Michelle Hazen, Roberta Ivey, Jeffery McGeshick, Mitchell McGeshick, Andrea Russell, June Saad, Henry Smith, and James Williams, Jr.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Jerry Avent, Earl Browne, Rose Marie Buchert, Lori Fitzgerald, Renee Galloway, Derek Geter, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Anthony Green, Keisha Hamm, Linda Madison, Lisa Martinez, Kevin Minor, Regina Nolte, Sharon Paavo, Burry Pough, Andrea Scarborough, Anastasia Sherman, Latanya Tarleton, Faith Thomas, Teresa Titus, Dianne Turner, Dominique de la Bay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Michelle Hazen, #2 Proposed Summons for Henry Smith, #3 Proposed Summons for Alice Brunk, #4 Proposed Summons for Andrea Russell, #5 Proposed Summons for Tina Caron, #6 Proposed Summons for Mitchell McGeshick, #7 Proposed Summons for Jeffery McGeshick, #8 Proposed Summons for Roberta Ivey, #9 Proposed Summons for June Saad)(Bennett, Leonard)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6710605), filed by Burry Pough, Faith Thomas, Rose Marie Buchert, Dianne Turner, Anthony Green, Sharon Paavo, Renee Galloway, Linda Madison, Latanya Tarleton, Sonji Grandy, Lucinda Gray, Earl Browne, Dominique de la Bay, Kevin Minor, Lisa Martinez, Jerry Avent, Keisha Hamm, Anastasia Sherman, Regina Nolte, Lori Fitzgerald, Teresa Titus, Derek Geter, Andrea Scarborough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (Bennett, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway et al v. Williams, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Brunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell McGeshick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery McGeshick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burry Pough
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Minor
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Madison
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Galloway
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Sherman
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Turner
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Geter
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Scarborough
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Paavo
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Marie Buchert
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Nolte
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Thomas
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Tarleton
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Hamm
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Fitzgerald
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Avent
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Browne
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Green
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Gray
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique de la Bay
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonji Grandy
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Titus
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Martinez
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: John Gerard Albanese
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?