Hill-Green v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Hill-Green
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00476
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Trans Union, LLC answer due 8/26/2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 07/29/2019. (tjoh, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Ward, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Hill-Green Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Trans Union, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 (tjoh, )
June 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (smej, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Equifax Information Services and Trans Union, LLC by Lisa E. Hill-Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Trans Union)(Bennett, Leonard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6713583), filed by Lisa E. Hill-Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bennett, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill-Green v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hill-Green
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?