Trepeta v. Capital One, National Association
Plaintiff: Robert Trepeta
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00485
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Scott Kelly on behalf of Capital One, National Association (Kelly, Harrison)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Kelley Conkle on behalf of Capital One, National Association (Conkle, Brooke)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One, National Association. (Hubbard, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One, National Association. (Hubbard, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Stuart Hubbard on behalf of Capital One, National Association (Hubbard, Jonathan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - For good cause shown, it is ORDERED that: The Motion #5 is GRANTED, and Defendant Capital One, National Association shall be GRANTED an extension of time up to and including August 23, 2019 to file its responsive pleadings or other pre-answer motion to Plaintiff's Class Complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 07/15/2019. (smej, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One, National Association. (Flynn, Virginia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Capital One, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Virginia)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Trepeta Capital One, National Association served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019 (Keller, Tara) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2019) (smej, ).
July 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One, National Association. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Robert Trepeta. (Keller, Tara)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6717380), filed by Robert Trepeta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trepeta v. Capital One, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Trepeta
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Hubbard
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?