CSC Leasing Co. v. Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CSC Leasing Co.
Defendant: Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC and Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00494
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. The plaintiff brings this case in federal court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, which grants federal jurisdiction for civil actions between citizens of different states. Section 1332 requires complete diversity of citizenship. Caterpillar Inc. v. Lewis, 519 U.S. 61, 68 (1996). A corporation is a citizen of (1) its state of incorporation and (2) the state where it has its principal place of business. 1332(c)(1). In contrast, a limited liability company ("LLC") derives its citizenship from its members. See Cent. W. Va. Energy Co. v. Mountain State Carbon, LLC, 636 F.3d 101, 103 (4th Cir. 2011). The Court needs additional information to confirm that complete diversity exists between the parties, thus assuring that it has subject matter jurisdiction in this case. The Court DIRECTS defendant Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC, to submit a full list of the citizenship of its respective members. To the extent any of its members are LLCs, the defendant shall also submit a full list of the citizenship of those entities. The defendant shall file this list within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 07/26/2019. Copy sent by U.S. mail to the defendant Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC via James Donnelly, Registered Agent, 101S. Tryon Street, Ste. 200, Charlotte, NC 28202. (walk, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Certificates of Compliance by the Secretary of the Commonwealth. Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC served on 07/25/2019, Answer due 08/15/2019 and Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc. served on 07/25/2019, Answer due 8/15/2019. (walk, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC and Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copies (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file them using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
July 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (walk, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by CSC Leasing Co.. (Selman, Andrew)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CSC Leasing Co.. (Selman, Andrew). Modified docket entry on 07/05/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint filed by CSC Leasing Co. against Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc., et al. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6724652). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Affidavit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet). (Selman, Andrew). Modified docket entry on 07/05/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSC Leasing Co. v. Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSC Leasing Co.
Represented By: James Kerr Donaldson
Represented By: Andrew Paul Selman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Athletic Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pursuit Health Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?