Griffiths v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Charles W. Griffiths
Defendant: PFI Services, Inc., Cyprexx Services, LLC, Dorothy A Bennett, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Dorothy A. Bennett
Case Number: 3:2019cv00503
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Charles W. Griffiths's ("Plaintiff) Motion to Remand (ECF No. #21 ), filed on July 31, 2019. The Court heard argument on Plaintiff's Motion on October 2, 2019. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Motion is GRANTED and the case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Caroline County. This case is CLOSED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/10/2019. (walk, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/10/2019. (walk, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2019 re #21 Motion to Remand filed by plaintiff Charles W. Griffiths. Argument heard. Findings given from the Bench; motion granted. Memorandum Opinion to enter. (rpiz)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (to occur immediately following motions hearing set this date) (rpiz)
September 3, 2019 Set Hearings as to #21 Motion to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion by Charles W. Griffiths for the Admission of Michael C. Tramell, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 05/28/2019. (walk, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Chad Trammell and Certification of Local Counsel Robert Field Moorman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6808793. by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion by Charles W. Griffiths for the Admission of John S. Odom, Jr., Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/20/2019. (walk, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John S. Odom, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Robert Field Moorman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6795709. by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Cleary, Annemarie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Maryia)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (Granting Unopposed Motion for Clinton T. Williams to Withdraw as Counsel) - The Court finds that the Motion to Withdraw should be and hereby is GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED and Clinton T. Williams is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Nationstar; and it is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the docket be amended to reflect that Mr. Williams has withdrawn as counsel for Nationstar and that he no longer needs to be noticed of any pleadings, motions, or other documents filed or served in this case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/14/2019. (smej, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Maryia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Amy B. Hackett to appear Pro hac vice for Cyprexx Services, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/7/19. (jsau, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy B. Hackett and Certification of Local Counsel Annemarie DiNardo Cleary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6775102. by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Cleary, Annemarie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Charles W. Griffiths. (Moorman, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Cyprexx Services, LLC.(Cleary, Annemarie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Jones, Maryia)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion by Nationstar Mortgage LLC for the Admission of Thomas G. Yoxall, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/22/2019. (walk, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion by Nationstar Mortgage LLC for the Admission of Matthew H. Davis, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/22/2019. (walk, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion by Nationstar Mortgage LLC for the Admission of Clinton T. Williams, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/22/2019. (walk, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Cleary, Annemarie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas G. Yoxall and Certification of Local Counsel Maryia Y. Jones Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6748385. by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Jones, Maryia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew H. Davis and Certification of Local Counsel Maryia Y. Jones Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6748282. by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Jones, Maryia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Clinton T. Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Maryia Y. Jones Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6748265. by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Jones, Maryia)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Dorothy A Bennett.(McGovern, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dorothy A Bennett. (McGovern, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dorothy A Bennett. (McGovern, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this matter came before the Court upon Defendant, Nationstar Mortgage LLC's ("Nationstar") Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff, Charles W. Griffiths. Upon consideration of the Consent Motion, the consent of Plaintiff, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Nationstar's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED that Nationstar shall file its responsive pleading on or before July 23, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 07/18/2019. (walk, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Maryia)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Cyprexx Services, LLC to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Cyprexx Services, LLC shall have up to and including July 23, 20 I 9, to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 7/17/19. (jsau, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by Cyprexx Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Annemarie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryia Yrjeuna Jones on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Jones, Maryia)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Annemarie DiNardo Cleary on behalf of Cyprexx Services, LLC (Cleary, Annemarie)
July 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Jones, Maryia). Modified docket entry on 07/12/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Removed from Caroline County Circuit Court, Case Number: CL19-399. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6734360). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C and #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jones, Maryia). Modified docket entry on 07/12/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffiths v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFI Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprexx Services, LLC
Represented By: Amy B. Hackett
Represented By: Annemarie DiNardo Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy A Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Represented By: Clinton Todd Williams
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Represented By: Matthew Hogan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy A. Bennett
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Griffiths
Represented By: Robert Field Moorman
Represented By: John Scogin Odom, Jr
Represented By: Michael Chad Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?