Hains v. Adams
Plaintiff: Maureen Hains
Defendant: Dawn M Adams and Dawn M. Adams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00504
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dawn M. Adams. (Seltzer, Cullen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dawn M. Adams. (Seltzer, Cullen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Lee Byrd on behalf of Dawn M. Adams (Byrd, L.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cullen Dennis Seltzer on behalf of Dawn M. Adams (Seltzer, Cullen)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Granting Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) - Having considered the Consent Motion to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint ("Motion") #5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant's deadline for responding to the Complaint shall be extended to September 1, 2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 07/17/2019. (smej, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Maureen Hains. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Hains. Dawn M. Adams served on 7/12/2019, Answer due 8/2/2019. (Allen, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dawn M Adams. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
July 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (walk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Maureen Hains. (Allen, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Maureen Hains against Dawn M. Adams. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6734608). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and #2 Letter). (Allen, Robert). Modified docket entry on 07/12/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hains v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M. Adams
Represented By: Cullen Dennis Seltzer
Represented By: L. Lee Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Hains
Represented By: Robert Jackson Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?