Hauser v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra S. Hauser
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Synchrony Bank, Experian Information Services, Inc., PNC Bank, NA, Barclays Bank Delaware, Bank of America, NA, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00516
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Barclays Bank pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A) (i) (ECF No. 10). It appearing appropriate to do so, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Barclays Bank. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/10/2019. (tjoh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Barclays Bank ONLY by Sandra S. Hauser (Krumbein, Jason)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra S. Hauser. Barclays Bank Delaware waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Krumbein, Jason) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct date text(tjoh, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra S. Hauser. Synchrony Bank waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Krumbein, Jason)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SunTrust Bank. SunTrust Bank waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Tan, Kendall)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Ostroff, Ethan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank. (Tan, Kendall)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Hamilton Tan on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Tan, Kendall)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, NA, Barclays Bank Delaware, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, PNC Bank, NA, SunTrust Bank, Synchrony Bank, TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
July 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sandra S. Hauser. (Krumbein, Jason)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6739968.), filed by Sandra S. Hauser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krumbein, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/16/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauser v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Represented By: Kendall Hamilton Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra S. Hauser
Represented By: Jason Meyer Krumbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?