Humphrey v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Charles C. Humphrey
Defendant: Bestway Transport, Inc., Steven E. Davis and Best Way Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Best Way Transportation, Inc., Steven E. Davis. (Keeney, Carter). Modified docket entry on 09/13/2019. (walk, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 09:10 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/21/19. (wtuc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Way Transportation, Inc., Steven E. Davis, filed by Charles C. Humphrey.(Hart, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Best Way Transportation, Inc.. (Keeney, Carter)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Best Way Transportation, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Best Way Transportation, Inc..(Keeney, Carter)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. CAME THIS DAY Plaintiff, by counsel, and moved this Court for leave to amend his Complaint to name the correct defendant. Defendants named in the Amended Complaint consent to such amendment. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's #3 motion for leave to amend is GRANTED; and it is hereby ORDERED that the Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend shall be deemed filed upon entry of this Order. It is SO ORDERED. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 8/15/19. (jsau, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Charles C. Humphrey. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Hart, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (walk, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Steven E. Davis and Bestway Transport, Inc. (Keeney, Carter). Modified docket entry on 07/22/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Steven E. Davis. Case removed from Richmond City Circuit Court, Case No. CL19-3441-2. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6751069). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B and #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Keeney, Carter). Modified docket entry on 07/22/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway Transport, Inc.
Represented By: William Tyler Shands
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Davis
Represented By: William Tyler Shands
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Way Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Humphrey
Represented By: Jason Matthew Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?