Keatts v. LeClairRyan, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Marci J. Keatts
Defendant: LeClairRyan, PLLC and ULX Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00535
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by ULX Partners, LLC.(Holdsworth, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE ANSWER #13 is granted and the defendant, ULX Partners, LLC, shall electronically file its by September 19, 2019. It is also ORDERED that the PLAINTIFF'S PRAECIPE REQUESTING ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT #12 is denied. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 09/19/2019. (smej, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 Reply to Motion re #12 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant ULX Partners, LLC, #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ULX Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holdsworth, Douglas)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362, this action is STAYED with respect to the defendant, LeClairRyan, PLLC, until further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the defendant shall file a report advising the status of this matter in bankruptcy by October 28, 2019, and every 45 days thereafter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 09/12/2019. (Copy forwarded to USBC) (smej, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Marci J. Keatts. (Butler, Harris) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/12/2019) (smej, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer CORRECTED filed by ULX Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holden, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Paul Holdsworth on behalf of ULX Partners, LLC (Holdsworth, Douglas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 (DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET ENTRY #16 ). Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ULX Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holden, Kevin) Modified on 9/12/2019 (smej, ).
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ULX Partners, LLC. (Holden, Kevin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant ULX Partners, LLC by Marci J. Keatts. (Attachments: #1 Delcaration)(Butler, Harris)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by LeClairRyan, PLLC of Bankruptcy Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Eve)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #7 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, LeClairRyan, PLLC, formerly LeClairRyan, a Professional Corporation, shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by September 4, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 08/22/2019. (smej, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Bryan Holbrook on behalf of LeClairRyan, PLLC (Holbrook, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by LeClairRyan, PLLC. (Campbell, Eve)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LeClairRyan, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Eve)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LeClairRyan, PLLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019; ULX Partners, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service of Summons) (Butler, Harris) Modified docket text on 8/14/2019 (smej, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LeClairRyan, PLLC, ULX Partners, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 summons 2)(tjoh, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/26/2019) (tjoh, ).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Marci J. Keatts. (Butler, Harris)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Marci J. Keatts. (Butler, Harris)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Marci J. Keatts of related case (Butler, Harris)
July 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6760125.), filed by Marci J. Keatts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Butler, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keatts v. LeClairRyan, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marci J. Keatts
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeClairRyan, PLLC
Represented By: Eve Grandis Campbell
Represented By: Richard Bryan Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULX Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kevin D. Holden
Represented By: Douglas Paul Holdsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?