Heath et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leana Yancey, Isabel Deleon, Marsha Heath, Sherry Blackburn and Ashley Grant
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation and Capital One Bank (USA)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00555
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Court GRANTS #8 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS all proceedings and deadlines in these cases until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motions to transfer and consolidate filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). The Court DIRECTS the defendants to file a status report with the Court within one (1) day of the JPML's decision on the motions to transfer and consolidate. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (jsmi, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Or, in Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Bennett, Leonard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Capital One Bank (USA), Capital One Financial Corporation, and Capital One, N.A. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (smej, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Stay Or, in Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA), Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Or, in Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Notice of Position Received) (Bennett, Leonard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Leonard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey. (Bennett, Leonard)
August 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Capital One Financial Corp, #2 Proposed summons - Capital One NA)(Bennett, Leonard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 DISREGARD. NOTICE by Sherry Blackburn, Isabel Deleon, Ashley Grant, Marsha Heath, Leana Yancey re #1 Complaint Continuation - Complaint Part 2 (Bennett, Leonard) Modified on 8/5/2019 (smej, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6771220), filed by Marsha Heath, Ashley Grant, Isabel Deleon, Sherry Blackburn, Leana Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bennett, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leana Yancey
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Deleon
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Heath
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Blackburn
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Grant
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth W. Hanes
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA)
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?