Keyes v. Swann et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Alonzo Keyes and Darnell Alonzo Keys
Defendant: R.N. Walton, Ms. Cunningham, A.W. Wilson, W. Hartley, A.W. Barbee, SIS Devalle-Soto, Ms. Liptak, Secretary Hicks, Counselor Ezell, Pa Holmes, Dr. Heck, Chief Psychologist Evenson, Brooke Lawler, A. Arias, EMT Ramsey, Ahs Hargrove, Ms. McCall, Lt. Daniels, Pharmacist Meyer, Dr. Magazine, J. McIntosh, Lt. Rodriquez, PA Gia, A.W. Robinson, Case Manager Bryant, Officer Prince, F/S Unit Team, Mrs. E. Ward, Unit Manager Bardin, Warden Batts, J. Ray Ormond, Captain Hicks, Lt. Hawkins, Unknown Duty Officer, Richard Swann and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2019cv00564
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee). It is ORDERED that: Plaintiff is to submit partial filing fee of $28.50 within eleven (11) days of entry hereof and remains liable for the entire fee; Court to contact institution to forward twenty percent (20%) of all deposits until $350.00 fee is paid; Plaintiff may move to voluntarily dismiss within eleven (11) days or he will be responsible for entire fee. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 9/25/19. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jsau, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION and Affidavit in Support by Darnell Alonzo Keyes to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (walk, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Consent to Collection of Fees by Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (walk, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by FCI Memphis as to Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (walk, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER that: (1) This action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; (2) Within 30 days, Plaintiff must submit a statement under oath or under penalty of perjury that (please see Memorandum Order for additional information); (3) The Clerk shall obtain a certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for the six month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; (4) Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee. Accordingly, he is required to read, sign, and return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days; and, (5) Failure to comply strictly with any of the above time requirements will result in summary dismissal of the action (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 08/23/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff with Consent to Collections of Fees form and IFP Affidavit. Letter and Inmate Account Report Form mailed to FCI Memphis. (walk ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. McIntosh, Richard Swann, Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 F-5)(jtho, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #8 Envelope) (jtho, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-02478. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re DE #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Darnell Alonzo Keyes, DE #12 MOTION Status,Default Judgement, Reimburse Back Pay and Compel filed by Darnell Alonzo Keyes signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 7/25/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION For Status,Default Judgement, Reimburse Back Pay and Compel by Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying DE #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; adopting Report and Recommendations re DE #8 Report and Recommendations signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/5/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Se NOTICE of Objection Of Order Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel And Report and Recommendation On Plaintiff's Motion For Reparate Injunction/Prohibitory Injunction by Darnell Alonzo Keyes (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REPARATIVE INJUNCTION/PROHIBITORY INJUNCTION and CLARIFICATION OF ORDER ASSESSING FILING FEES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 1/25/2019. (Vescovo, Diane) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: DE #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Darnell Alonzo Keyes; DE #6 MOTION to Clarify, signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/10/2018. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Pro Se NOTICE of questions regarding PLRA by Darnell Alonzo Keyes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Reparative Injunction and Prohibitory Injunction by Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (agj) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Assessing $350.00 Filing Fee in Accordance with PLRA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 07/18/2018. (Vescovo, Diane) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darnell Alonzo Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Transactions)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Darnell Alonzo Keyes against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Envelope (Front), #2 Envelope (Back), #3 Judicial Cards)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyes v. Swann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Alonzo Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Alonzo Keys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIS Devalle-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pa Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Psychologist Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMT Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahs Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacist Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Magazine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Gia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/S Unit Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Bardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ray Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Duty Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?