Street v. Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rahsaan Street
Defendant: Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Westlake Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00567
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Ward, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Westlake Services, LLC. (Gettings, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Westlake Services, LLC.(Gettings, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc.. (Gettings, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc..(Gettings, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SO ORDERED granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc. answer due 10/1/2019; Westlake Services, LLC answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 09/25/2019. (tjoh, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc., Westlake Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Gettings, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahsaan Street Westlake Services, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019 (Pittman, Dale)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Trans Union, LLC answer due 10/3/2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 09/5/2019. (tjoh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Ward on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Ward, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dean Domonoske on behalf of Rahsaan Street (Domonoske, Thomas)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahsaan Street Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Pittman, Dale)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahsaan Street Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Pittman, Dale)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahsaan Street Trans Union, LLC served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Pittman, Dale)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahsaan Street Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Pittman, Dale)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall be GRANTED an extension of time until on or before September 25, 2019 to file its responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Rahsaan Street. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/23/2019. (tjoh, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Defendants Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc., Westlake Services, LLC, d/b/a Westlake Financial Services, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rahsaan Street. (Pittman, Dale)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and demand for jury trial ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6781410.), filed by Rahsaan Street. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pittman, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Street v. Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Allen Towing & Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Gettings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Services, LLC
Represented By: David Michael Gettings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Ward
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahsaan Street
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Domonoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?