Onley et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Valerie N. Onley and Sjoerd T. Onley
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Trans Union, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00572
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Lee Ward and Certification of Local Counsel C. Dewayne Lonas Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6875417. by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Lonas, Carl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Hooe, Laura). Modified docket text on 10/4/2019 (sbea, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/02/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:15 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/02/2019. (nbrow)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Anthony, David). Modified docket text on 9/27/2019 (sbea, ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Gibson Sinclair Wright on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Wright, Gibson)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Ward, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT #15 is granted. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Trans Union, LLC, shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by September 25, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/5/19. (jsau, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the AGREED MOTION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S [sic] COMPLAINT #11 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Equifax Information Services, LLC, shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by October 4, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/5/19. (jsau, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #10 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by October 4, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/3/19. (jsau, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Ward, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Hooe, Laura)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooe, Laura)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.'S CONSENT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME #7 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by September 27, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 8/29/19. (jsau, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Anthony, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura May Hooe on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Hooe, Laura) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/26/2019) (jsau, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Dewayne Lonas on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Lonas, Carl) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/26/2019) (jsau, ).
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. All defendants served on 8/14/19, answer due 9/4/19 (Kennedy, Emily) Modified docket text on 8/22/2019 (jsau, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
August 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsau, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to all Defendants by Sjoerd T. Onley, Valerie N. Onley. (Kennedy, Emily)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6782795.), filed by Sjoerd T. Onley, Valerie N. Onley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Emily) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/12/2019) (jsau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onley et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie N. Onley
Represented By: Emily Connor Kennedy
Represented By: Mark Clifton Leffler
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Relyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sjoerd T. Onley
Represented By: Emily Connor Kennedy
Represented By: Mark Clifton Leffler
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Relyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Carl Dewayne Lonas
Represented By: Laura May Hooe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Ward
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?