Tyler v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rose Tyler
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00584
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Having reviewed the JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT #19 , and it appearing that the disputes in this action have been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that, by October 15, 2019, the parties shall either electronically file a Stipulation of Dismissal or submit a Dismissal Order to the Court for entry. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's MOTION FOR REMAND #6 is denied as moot and the hearing scheduled for 2:00 p.m. October 9, 2019 is cancelled. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/1/19. (jsau, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by Rose Tyler (Rabkin, Ilya)
September 25, 2019 Settlement Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. (mful, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on October 31, 2019 at 10:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. In addition to counsel, each party must have a representative physically present with the full authority to settle this action. See Order for details. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 9/25/19. (jsau, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/19/19. (khan, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Having consulted with counsel at the Initial Pretrial Conference on September 18, 2019, and counsel for the defendant having agreed, and finding good cause so to do, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file, on September 30, 2019, her rebuttal brief to defendant's MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND (ECF No. 13). It is further ORDERED that oral argument on the MOTION FOR REMAND (ECF No. 6) shall be held at 2:00 p.m. October 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 09/19/2019. (tjoh, )
September 19, 2019 Case referred to Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young for settlement purposes. (tjoh, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference and proceedings required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Young within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference to occur within the fifty-day period required by paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order or at such other time as Magistrate Judge Young shall approve. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 09/19/2019. (tjoh, )
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (khan, )
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7400 before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (khan, )
September 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/18/2019. (khan, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Statement Respecting Consent by Rose Tyler re: #5 Order. (Rabkin, Ilya). Modified docket entry on 09/16/2019. (walk, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Discovery Response)(Moore, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Statement Respecting Consent by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re: #5 Order. (Moore, Joseph). Modified docket entry on 09/13/2019. (walk, ).
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Moore, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 , #8 , #9 MOTIONS to Remand to State Court: Clerk has corrected the docket, terminated the duplicate motions and linked the #10 Memorandum in Support to the initial #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk has also notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for filing future Motions and Memoranda in Support. No further action is required at this time. (smej, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rose Tyler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Rabkin, Ilya) Modified to correct docket entry on 9/11/2019 (smej, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rose Tyler. (Rabkin, Ilya)
September 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Filing attorney has been instructed to separate the memorandum in support from the motion and file it in its own docket entry using the Memorandum in Support docket event with the separated exhibits as attachments. (smej, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rose Tyler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rabkin, Ilya)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #7 ; the filing user is requested to file the Memorandum in Support as a separate document using the filing event: Memorandum in Support (located under Responses and Replies), and link the document to the motion. The filing user is also requested to upload and identify each exhibit separately. Multiple exhibits should not be grouped into one attachment. (walk, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rose Tyler. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Rabkin, Ilya). Modified Exhibit label name on 9/11/2019 (sbea, ).
September 9, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #6 ; the filing user is notified that the filing user's login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing user's signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. PLEASE NOTE: The complete nine-element signature block must be included with every document (please refer to page 29 of the E-Filing Policies and Procedures.) The filing user is also requested to file the Memorandum in Support as a separate document and to include the exhibits as separate attachments. (walk, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rose Tyler. (Rabkin, Ilya)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that it appearing that the above-captioned case is set for an Initial Pretrial Conference on September 18, 2019; and, upon examination of the file and consideration of the Court's docket, and it appearing that this action would be sooner resolved if the parties consent to referral of the case in its entirety to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer (of course, preserving the right to trial by jury if such has been demanded), it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether both parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the plaintiff shall assure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than September 11, 2019, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. September 13, 2019 whether such consents (by all parties) have been given; and, to avoid confusion, counsel for each party shall file, not later than 5:00 p.m. September 13, 2019 a Statement Respecting Consent wherein the position of the party (whether consenting or not) shall be clearly set forth. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 09/05/2019. (walk, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 08/30/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A)(nbrow)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 08/30/2019. (nbrow)
August 14, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Moore, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6788160), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Email Correspondence, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Jury Demand) (Moore, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Tyler
Represented By: Damon LeRoy Pendleton
Represented By: Ilya Rabkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?