Barnes et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Biggs, Joseph Cook, Kimberly Barnes, Bret Glidewell, Devon Reid, Michael Lewis, David Curto and Amanda Comonte
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00587
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. re #18 Order on Motion to Stay,, (Notice of JPML Decision) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of JPML Decision)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 17, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the Court GRANTS #17 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS all proceedings and deadlines in these cases until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motions to transfer and consolidate filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). The Court DIRECTS the defendants to file a status report with the Court within one (1) day of the JPML's decision on the motions to transfer and consolidate. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (jsmi, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Stay OR, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings) (Zinsner, Mary) Modified docket text on 8/16/2019 (smej, ).
August 14, 2019 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division Division. Case Number 1:19cv1021. (jsau, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that this civil action be consolidated for all pretrial purposes with 1:19-cv- 1008 and l:19-cv-979 and transferred to the Richmond Division to be consolidated with 3:19-cv-555. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 08/13/2019. (dvanm, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Tempe Dorinda Smith. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (acha, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Scott Ashley Powell. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (dest, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jason Wayne Early. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (acha, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael Wilson Slocumb. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (dest, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Christopher Scott Randolph, Jr. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (dest, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Scott Randolph, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Alan Yoder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6777986. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Wilson Slocumb and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Alan Yoder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6777985. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tempe Dorinda Smith and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Alan Yoder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6777983. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Ashley Powell and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Alan Yoder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6777982. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Wayne Early and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Alan Yoder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6777981. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Capital One, N.A. by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Capital One Financial Corporation by Kimberly Barnes, Crystal Biggs, Amanda Comonte, Joseph Cook, David Curto, Bret Glidewell, Michael Lewis, Devon Reid. (Yoder, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re attachment to #1 Complaint. Filing user has been notified that the summons have been removed as filed in error and should be refiled as a separate entry. Filing user has been referred to the Attorney Civil Case Opening directions for further information. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint KIMBERLY BARNES, et al. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6775140.), filed by BRET GLIDEWELL, AMANDA COMONTE, JOSEPH COOK, DEVON REID, DAVID CURTO, KIMBERLY BARNES, MICHAEL LEWIS, CRYSTAL BIGGS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Capital One Financial Corporation Summons, #3 Capital One, N.A. Summons, #4 Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Summons)(Yoder, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/7/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/7/2019) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/7/2019) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Biggs
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cook
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Barnes
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Glidewell
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Reid
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Curto
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Comonte
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?