Gregory v. Brown
Plaintiff: Ryan Gregory
Defendant: Sean Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00685
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing the Clerk to Remail the Last Memorandum Order) - The Clerk is DIRECTED to remail the October 17, 2019 Memorandum Order to Plaintiff in the address set forth at ECF No. 7-1. Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension fifteen (15) days from the date of entry hereof to comply with terms of the October 17, 2019 Memorandum Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/15/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (smej, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ryan Gregory @ Western Tidewater Regional Jail (tjoh, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan Gregory. Address updated as requested. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsau, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff has complied with the prior Memorandum Order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED 1. Within eleven (11) days of the date of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit an initial partial filing fee of $6.63 or state under penalty of perjury that he does not have sufficient assets to pay such a fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1); 2. Plaintiff remains liable for the entire filing fee of $350.00. After Plaintiff pays the initial partial filing fee or it is waived, the Court will contact Plaintiff's place of incarceration. The institution will then forward to the Court twenty percent (20%) of all deposits into Plaintiff's account until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid; 3. If Plaintiff is unable or unwilling to comply with any of the above procedures, he may move to voluntarily dismiss the action. If Plaintiff so moves, he will be relieved of the filing fee for the present action. If Plaintiff persists in prosecuting the action or fails to voluntarily dismiss the action within eleven (11) days of the date of entry hereof, he will be responsible for paying the entire filing fee. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 10/17/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (walk, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Consent to Collection of Fees by Ryan Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ryan Gregory. (smej, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 09/25/2019. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (smej, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sean Brown, filed by Ryan Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?