Alexander v. Diet Madison Avenue et al
Plaintiff: Joe Alexander
Defendant: DMA Doe Defendants 1-17, Patrick Coffee, Adweek, LLC and Diet Madison Avenue
Intervenor: The Martin Agency, Inc. and The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00688
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.:Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2019 re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information filed by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.; the motion to intervene is granted; the original complaint is placed under seal; the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by December 10. (Court Reporter G. Halasz, OCR.)(wtuc, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Court GRANTS #5 motion to intervene and to seal confidential information. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to SEAL the complaint. The parties shall refer to Alexander's accuser as " Jane Doe." The plaintiff shall file an amended complaint with appropriate redactions by December 10, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/8/2019. (jsmi, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Complaint)(Lacy, David)
October 28, 2019 Set as to #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information: Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 03:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (wtuc, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Rebuttal Brief re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information filed by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Lacy, David)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information filed by Joe Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Biss, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERS granting #7 and #8 Motions for Pro hac vice. Maura Jeanne Wogan and Nicole Bergstrom appointed for The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc. and The Martin Agency, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/10/2019. (jsmi, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Court GRANTS IN PART proposed intervenor's #12 motion for provisional sealing or for expedited hearing. The Court declines to provisionally seal the complaint. The Court, however, will order expedited briefing on the proposed intervenors' #5 motion to seal. Within 7 days of this Order, the plaintiff shall respond to the motion to seal. The proposed intervenors may file a reply within 3 days of the plaintiff's response. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/10/2019. (jsmi, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Seal Provisionally Or Alternatively For Expedited Hearing filed by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Lacy, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Provisionally Or Alternatively For Expedited Hearing by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Lacy, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Fisher White, Lauren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information (Fisher White, Lauren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information filed by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Maura Wogan, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Maura Wogan, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Maura Wogan, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Maura Wogan, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Maura Wogan, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Maura Wogan)(Fisher White, Lauren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole Bergstrom and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren E. Fisher White Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877735. by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Fisher White, Lauren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Maura Jeanne Wogan and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren E. Fisher White Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6877720. by The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc.. (Fisher White, Lauren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brendan Lacy on behalf of The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc., The Martin Agency, Inc. (Lacy, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene and to Seal Confidential Information by The Martin Agency, Inc., The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher White, Lauren)
September 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. Filing attorney notified to file proposed summons for defendant Diet Madison Avenue. (jsmi, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Adweek, LLC and Patrick Coffee. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
September 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (jsmi, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Joe Alexander. (Biss, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Joe Alexander. (Biss, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6846106.), filed by Joe Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Diet Madison Avenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMA Doe Defendants 1-17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Coffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adweek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diet Madison Avenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Alexander
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Martin Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Jeanne Wogan
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Fisher White
Represented By: Nicole Bergstrom
Represented By: David Brendan Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Interpublic Group of Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Jeanne Wogan
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Fisher White
Represented By: Nicole Bergstrom
Represented By: David Brendan Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?