Piron et al v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron and Bounsou Thamvanthongkham
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00709
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Having considered the CONSENT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME REGARDING RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. See Order for deadlines and details. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/12/19. (jsau, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint) by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(West, Jennifer)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. (MacBride, Neil)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. (MacBride, Neil)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Paul S. Mishkin to appear Pro hac vice for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/16/19. (jsau, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Craig J. Bergman to appear Pro hac vice for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/16/19. (jsau, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Rene Sara Roupinian to appear Pro hac vice for Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron,and Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/16/19. (jsau, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jack Raisner to appear Pro hac vice for Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron,and Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/16/19. (jsau, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mollie Piron, Stephanie Merino, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019 (West, Jennifer)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham re #5 Amended Complaint, #10 Summons Issued, (West, Jennifer)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul S. Mishkin and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6884319. by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig J. Bergman and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6882541. by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Amended Complaint #5 for General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Harvey MacBride on behalf of General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. (MacBride, Neil)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. (West, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rene Sara Roupinian and Certification of Local Counsel Jennifer J. West Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6876751. by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. (West, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Raisner and Certification of Local Counsel Jennifer J. West Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6876741. by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham. (West, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc., filed by Mollie Piron, Stephanie Merino, Bounsou Thamvanthongkham.(West, Jennifer)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mollie Piron, Stephanie Merino General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019 (West, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
September 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsau, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Stephanie Merino, Mollie Piron. (West, Jennifer) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/30/2019) (jsau, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6860932.), filed by Mollie Piron, Stephanie Merino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(West, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piron et al v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Merino
Represented By: Jennifer Jo West
Represented By: Jack Raisner
Represented By: Edward Everett Bagnell, Jr
Represented By: Rene Sara Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mollie Piron
Represented By: Jennifer Jo West
Represented By: Jack Raisner
Represented By: Edward Everett Bagnell, Jr
Represented By: Rene Sara Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bounsou Thamvanthongkham
Represented By: Jennifer Jo West
Represented By: Jack Raisner
Represented By: Rene Sara Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Represented By: Craig J Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?