Derbyshire Baptist Church v. Church Mutual Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Derbyshire Baptist Church
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00731
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Derbyshire Baptist Church. (Streit, Kevin)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 9:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Church Mutual Insurance Co..(Hudgins, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Church Mutual Insurance Co.. (Hudgins, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Hudgins on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Co. (Hudgins, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derbyshire Baptist Church Church Mutual Insurance Co. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019 (Arkema, Bruce)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Church Mutual Insurance Co. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons on Church Mutual Ins. Co. by Derbyshire Baptist Church. (Arkema, Bruce)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Derbyshire Baptist Church. (Arkema, Bruce)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6872046.), filed by Derbyshire Baptist Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Arkema, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derbyshire Baptist Church v. Church Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: David D. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derbyshire Baptist Church
Represented By: Bruce Edwin Arkema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?